THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:01:04 AM
Alhazmi, Areej Ibrahim Saleem
CPSO#:
90295
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
28 Sep 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
29 Sep 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Nephrology |
Effective:27 Sep 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 15 Mar 2009 to 25 May 2009
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jan 2010 to 01 Mar 2010
PEAP - R - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2010 to 03 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Mar 2011 to 03 Mar 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 04 Mar 2012 to 02 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Mar 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 02 Mar 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 03 Mar 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 29 Sep 2016 to 31 Aug 2017
CF - Nephrology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Sep 2017 to 28 Sep 2017
CF - Nephrology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 15 Mar 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 25 May 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Mar 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 29 Sep 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2017 |