skip to content

Alavian Ghavanini, Ahmad

CPSO#: 87003

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Persian

Education:Shiraz University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 6858
Fax: (905) 813-4229 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

89 Queensway West
Unit 500
Mississauga ON  L5V 2B2
Canada
Phone: 9052326556
Fax: 9052326557
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Ahmad Alavian Ghavanini Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 05 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alavian Ghavanini ( CPSO# 87003 )

Business Address:
89 Queensway West Unit 500
Mississauga ON  L5V 2B2
Phone Number: 905-232-6556

Business Address:
Credit Valley Hospital
EMG Lab
2200 Eglinton Avenue
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AHMAD ALAVIAN GHAVANINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAVIAN GHAVANINI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 06 Sep 2007
AVP - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 07 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012