THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 5:12:42 AM
Alavian Ghavanini, Ahmad
CPSO#:
87003
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
30 Jun 2012
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Persian
Education: Shiraz University, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue
Mississauga ON L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-1100 Ext. 6858
Fax: (905) 813-4229
Electoral District: 05
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital |
Mississauga |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. AHMAD ALAVIAN GHAVANINI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAVIAN GHAVANINI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 06 Sep 2007
AVP - Neurology
University of Toronto, 07 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2010 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Neurology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Neurology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 07 Sep 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 30 Jun 2012 |