Alaref, Amer Aref (CPSO#: 98550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Aug 2017

Expiry Date:  30 Jun 2024

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 15 Aug 2017

Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Damascus, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 rue Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Alaref Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 07 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Alaref ( CPSO# 98550 )

Business Address:
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 15 Aug 2017 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Sep 2012
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Aug 2017
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024

Practice Restrictions Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status More Information
Registration Committee Effective: 15 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            1.    Dr. Amer Aref Alaref may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in  a  setting  that  is  approved  by  the  Chair,  Department  of
                        Diagnostic  Radiology,  Division  of  Clinical  Sciences,  Northern
                        Ontario  School  of Medicine, in which Dr. Alaref holds an academic
                        appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  seven years from
                  the  date  of  issuance  or when Dr. Alaref no longer holds the  academic
                  appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

            3.    The certificate of registration  automatically expires upon the following
                  events, unless the Registration Committee  renews the certificate with or
                  without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

                  (i)   the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Alaref's clinical
                        performance, knowledge, skill, judgment,  professional  conduct, or
                        academic progress is unsatisfactory, or
                  
                  (ii)  the  Committee  does  not  receive  an annual report or receives  a
                        report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or
                  
                  (iii) when the Committee makes a decision about  Dr. Alaref's certificate
                        of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment
                        report. 
                  
            Note: This certificate is issued on August 15, 2017, and  expires  on  June 30,
                  2024.   Upon renewal of Dr. Alaref's academic appointment at the Northern
                  Ontario School  of  Medicine, the expiry date can be extended, subject to
                  the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.