THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
07/05/24 14:13:39 PM
Alaref, Amer Aref
CPSO#:
98550
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
15 Aug 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
15 Aug 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Damascus Faculty of Medici, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
980 rue Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Electoral District: 09
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre |
Thunder Bay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Diagnostic Radiology |
Effective:10 Aug 2023 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 21 Sep 2012
PEAP - CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 22 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
CF - Diagnostic Radiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2012 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2014 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jan 2016 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 15 Aug 2017 |
Expiry as per terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 06 Dec 2022 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration |
Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2024 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 10 Aug 2023 |
|
Active |