skip to content

Alakkad, Husni Abdulrahman O

CPSO#: 86164

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 28 May 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 25 Mar 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:King Faisal University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1100 Youville Dr West NW
Grey Nuns Community Hospital
Anesthesiology & Pain Medicine
Edmonton AB  T6L 5X8
Phone: 780-735-7000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Alberta
Saudi Arabia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. HUSNI ABDULRAHMAN O ALAKKAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALAKKAD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 28 May 2007 to 19 Aug 2007
PEAP - R - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2007 to 19 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2008 to 19 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2009 to 19 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2010 to 19 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jan 2015
CF - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 28 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Aug 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2014