THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 4:56:36 AM
Alakkad, Husni Abdulrahman O
CPSO#:
86164
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
25 Mar 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: King Faisal University, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Alberta
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Anesthesiology |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 28 May 2007 to 19 Aug 2007
PEAP - R - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2007 to 19 Aug 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2008 to 19 Aug 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2009 to 19 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2010 to 19 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 20 Aug 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Anesthesiology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Jan 2015
CF - Anesthesiology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 28 May 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 20 Aug 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 25 Mar 2014 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2021 |