skip to content

Alabduljalil, Talal M A A

CPSO#: 88250

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 May 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Nov 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Kuwait University, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery, FOM
Kuwait University
behind blood bank
2nd floor
Jabriya none
Kuwait
Phone: +96556562020

Additional Practice Location(s)

Alabduljalil Eye Clinic
Block1, street 114, building 82
5th floor
Sabah Al-Salem none
Kuwait
Kuwait
Phone: +96522061112
County: 
Electoral District: 

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Kuwait
USA - Oregon

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. TALAL M A A ALABDULJALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALABDULJALIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Ophthalmology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Jul 2015
CF - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2013