THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 14:43:18 PM
Alabduljalil, Talal M A A
CPSO#:
88250
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 May 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Nov 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Kuwait University Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery, FOM
Kuwait University
behind blood bank
2nd floor
Jabriya none
Kuwait
Phone: +96556562020
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kuwait
USA - Oregon
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Ophthalmology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. TALAL M A A ALABDULJALIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALABDULJALIL is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 May 2008 to 01 Jun 2008
PEAP - R - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 02 Jun 2008 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
CF - Ophthalmology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 18 Jul 2015
CF - Ophthalmology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 May 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 Jun 2008 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Nov 2013 |