skip to content

Al-Ozairi, Abdullah S S S

CPSO#: 85985

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Mar 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 09 Apr 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Aberdeen, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Toronto Western Hospital 399 Bathurst Street Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Date Received: 05 Aug 2015


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Kuwait

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective:23 May 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABDULLAH S S S AL-OZAIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-OZAIRI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Mar 2007 to 23 May 2007
PEAP - R - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 24 May 2007 to 23 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 24 May 2008 to 23 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 24 May 2009 to 23 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 24 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 24 May 2011 to 23 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 24 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Jan 2014
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 03 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Sep 2014
CF - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Apr 2013