THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 6:38:23 AM
Al-Ozairi, Abdullah S S S
CPSO#:
85985
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Mar 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
09 Apr 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Aberdeen School of Medicin, 2004
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:Toronto Western Hospital
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON M5T 2S8
Date Received: 05 Aug 2015
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Kuwait
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Psychiatry |
Effective:23 May 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ABDULLAH S S S AL-OZAIRI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-OZAIRI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Mar 2007 to 23 May 2007
PEAP - R - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 24 May 2007 to 23 May 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 24 May 2008 to 23 May 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 24 May 2009 to 23 May 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 24 May 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 23 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 24 May 2011 to 23 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 24 May 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 02 Jan 2014
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 03 Jan 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
CF - Psychiatry
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 01 Sep 2014
CF - Psychiatry
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Mar 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 24 May 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Apr 2013 |