skip to content

Al-Mahr, Ghadah Mansour Ali

CPSO#: 93501

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Jan 2019
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 16 Apr 2018

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Faisal University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 03 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2018 to 15 Apr 2018
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 16 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jan 2019
CF - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jan 2019