THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 15:08:53 PM
Al-Mahr, Ghadah Mansour Ali
CPSO#:
93501
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
31 Jan 2019
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
16 Apr 2018
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Faisal University, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 02 Aug 2010
PEAP - CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 03 Aug 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Pediatrics
McMaster University, 01 Feb 2018 to 15 Apr 2018
PEAP - CF - Paediatric Critical Care
McMaster University, 16 Apr 2018 to 30 Jun 2018
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2018 to 31 Jan 2019
CF - Paediatric Critical Care
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2010 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 03 Aug 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Feb 2018 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 16 Apr 2018 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 31 Jan 2019 |