skip to content

Al-Dahery, Abdullah Rageh Atallah

CPSO#: 85643

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 26 Sep 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 01 Nov 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Abdul Aziz University, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
No Speciality Reported

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2006 to 26 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

University of Ottawa, 27 Oct 2006 to 26 Sep 2007
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 27 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Oct 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 26 Sep 2007