THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
29/03/24 2:44:15 AM
Al-Dahery, Abdullah Rageh Atallah
CPSO#:
85643
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
26 Sep 2007
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
01 Nov 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Abdul Aziz University, 1990
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 27 Sep 2006 to 26 Oct 2006
PEAP - CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
University of Ottawa, 27 Oct 2006 to 26 Sep 2007
CF - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 27 Sep 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Oct 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 26 Sep 2007 |