skip to content

Al-Ali, Kaes Abdul-Settar

CPSO#: 85954

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 14 Jul 2011
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 14 Jul 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: Ali, Kaes Abdul Settar Mohammed (used until: 11 Jun 2011 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:Saddam College of Medicine, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 209
1005 Elgin Street West
Cobourg ON  K9A 5J4
Phone: (905) 373-4366
Fax: (905) 373-0687 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Canada
Phone: (905) 372-6811
County: County of Northumberland
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Kaes Al-Ali Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 10 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Al-Ali ( CPSO# 85954 )

Business Address:
209 - 1005 Elgin Street West
Cobourg ON  K9A 5J4
Phone Number: (905) 373-4366

Business Address:
1000 De Palma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. KAES ABDUL-SETTAR AL-ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-ALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 14 Feb 2007 to 20 Mar 2007
PEAP - CF - General Surgery

McMaster University, 21 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Sep 2007
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2011