THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 9:08:27 AM
Al-Ali, Kaes Abdul-Settar
CPSO#:
85954
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
14 Jul 2011
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
14 Jul 2011
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
Ali, Kaes Abdul Settar Mohammed (used until: 11 Jun 2011 )
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Saddam College of Medicine, 1997
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1176 Division St
Cobourg ON K9A 0Z4
Phone: 289 252 2521
Fax: 289 677 9557
Electoral District: 06
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Northumberland Hills Hospital |
Cobourg |
Ross Memorial Hospital |
Lindsay |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2011 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. KAES ABDUL-SETTAR AL-ALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-ALI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 14 Feb 2007 to 20 Mar 2007
PEAP - CF - General Surgery
McMaster University, 21 Mar 2007 to 30 Jun 2007
CF - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
AVP - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 14 Feb 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 22 Sep 2007 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2011 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 14 Jul 2011 |