skip to content

AlAli, Abdulaziz Saad S

CPSO#: 86127

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 20 Dec 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 20 Dec 2016

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mackenzie Health
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone: 905-883-1212 Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Illinois
USA - Missouri
USA - Washington

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective:30 Jun 2016 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ABDULAZIZ SAAD S ALALI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALALI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 09 May 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PEAP - R - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 07 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 08 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 09 May 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Dec 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2016