THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 9:24:01 AM
AlAli, Abdulaziz Saad S
CPSO#:
86127
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership as of
28 Sep 2021
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
20 Dec 2016
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: King Saud University, Riyadh College of, 2006
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois
USA - Missouri
USA - Washington
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neurosurgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:27 Sep 2017 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 09 May 2007 to 31 Jul 2007
PEAP - R - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2007 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Jul 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2011 to 31 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Aug 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 07 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 08 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2007 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Dec 2016 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 20 Dec 2016 |
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership |
Expiry: 28 Sep 2021 |