skip to content

Al Turkistany, Ahmed Qurban Mirza

CPSO#: 85558

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2012
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 09 Nov 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:King Khalid University, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective:11 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 06 Nov 2006
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 07 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 08 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 09 Nov 2007 to 08 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 09 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 09 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 08 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012