THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 8:11:17 AM
Al Turkistany, Ahmed Qurban Mirza
CPSO#:
85558
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2012
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
09 Nov 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: King Khalid University College of Medici, 2002
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Orthopedic Surgery |
Effective:11 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2006 to 06 Nov 2006
PEAP - R - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 07 Nov 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 08 Nov 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 09 Nov 2007 to 08 Nov 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 09 Nov 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 08 Nov 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 09 Nov 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 07 Dec 2010
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 08 Oct 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2012 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Orthopedic Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2012 |