skip to content

Al Sufiani, Fahd Mayouf Hasan

CPSO#: 91610

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 30 Jun 2015
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 12 Aug 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medici, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective:30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 11 Aug 2009
PEAP - R - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Aug 2009 to 10 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Aug 2010 to 10 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Aug 2011 to 13 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jan 2012 to 11 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 May 2012 to 11 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2015