THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 13:22:21 PM
Al Sufiani, Fahd Mayouf Hasan
CPSO#:
91610
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
30 Jun 2015
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
12 Aug 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medici, 2003
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Neuropathology |
Effective:30 Jun 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2009 to 11 Aug 2009
PEAP - R - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 Aug 2009 to 10 Aug 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Aug 2010 to 10 Aug 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 11 Aug 2011 to 13 Jan 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 14 Jan 2012 to 11 May 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 May 2012 to 11 May 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 12 May 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neuropathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anatomical Pathology
Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anatomical Pathology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 12 Aug 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2015 |