skip to content

Al Osaimi, Noura Matoug

CPSO#: 97497

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Mar 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Mar 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Umm Al Qura University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
U of Ottawa Health Services
University of Ottawa
300-100 Marie Curie Pvt.
Ottawa ON  K1N 6N9
Phone: (613) 564-3950
Fax: 613-564-6627 Electoral District: 07

Additional Practice Location(s)

Carlton University Sport Medicine
Ottawa ON  K1S 5B6
Canada
Phone: (613) 520-3510
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saudi Arabia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:04 May 2015 RCPSC Specialist
Rheumatology Effective:03 Jan 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. NOURA MATOUG AL OSAIMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL OSAIMI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 07 May 2012 to 03 Jun 2012
EL - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Jan 2017
CF - Rheumatology

University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2017 to 28 Feb 2017
CF - Rheumatology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 09 May 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 03 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Feb 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2017