THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 7:56:46 AM
Al Osaimi, Noura Matoug
CPSO#:
97497
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Mar 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Mar 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: Umm Al-Qura University Faculty of Medici, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Carlton University Sport Medicine
Ottawa ON K1S 5B6
Phone: (613) 520-3510
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Saudi Arabia
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:04 May 2015 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Rheumatology |
Effective:03 Jan 2016 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. NOURA MATOUG AL OSAIMI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL OSAIMI is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 07 May 2012 to 03 Jun 2012
EL - Rheumatology
University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 03 Nov 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Rheumatology
University of Ottawa, 04 Nov 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Jan 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Rheumatology
University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
CF - Rheumatology
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 03 Jan 2017
CF - Rheumatology
University of Ottawa, 04 Jan 2017 to 28 Feb 2017
CF - Rheumatology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 09 May 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 03 Jun 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 05 Nov 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 28 Feb 2017 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Mar 2017 |