skip to content

Al Dughaishi, Tamima Rashid Humoud

CPSO#: 85690

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of 12 Oct 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 25 Nov 2006

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Sultan Qaboos University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:26 Sep 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 12 Oct 2006 to 24 Nov 2006
PEAP - CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Nov 2006 to 11 Oct 2007
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 12 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 12 Oct 2008
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 12 Oct 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Nov 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 12 Oct 2008