THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
20/04/24 3:16:20 AM
Al Dughaishi, Tamima Rashid Humoud
CPSO#:
85690
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Terms and conditions as of
12 Oct 2008
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
25 Nov 2006
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Female
Languages Spoken:
ENGLISH
Education: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medi, 1998
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:26 Sep 2006 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 12 Oct 2006 to 24 Nov 2006
PEAP - CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 25 Nov 2006 to 11 Oct 2007
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 12 Oct 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 12 Oct 2008
CF - Maternal-Fetal Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 12 Oct 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 25 Nov 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 12 Oct 2008 |