skip to content

Ahmed, Syed Zaki

CPSO#: 86068

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 21 Jul 2009
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 21 Jul 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Urdu

Education:University of Karachi, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Dept of Critical Care Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6000 Electoral District: 09

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Syed Zaki Ahmed Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 23 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ahmed ( CPSO# 86068 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional HSC
Department of Critical Care Medicine
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:15 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:23 Sep 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. SYED ZAKI AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2007
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Apr 2007
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Apr 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Aug 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jul 2009