THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
26/04/24 23:29:20 PM
Ahmed, Syed Zaki
CPSO#:
86068
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
21 Jul 2009
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
21 Jul 2009
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Urdu
Education: University of Karachi, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
Administration
North York ON M3M 0B2
Phone: 416-242-1000
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Humber River Hospital |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Internal Medicine |
Effective:15 Jun 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Critical Care Medicine |
Effective:23 Sep 2009 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. SYED ZAKI AHMED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AHMED is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Apr 2007 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Apr 2007 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 03 Apr 2010 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 22 Aug 2008 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jul 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 21 Jul 2009 |