skip to content

Ade-Conde, Adetunji James

CPSO#: 97205

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Yoruba

Education:University of Lagos, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Halton Hills Womens Centre
83 Mill St
Georgetown ON  L7G 5E9
Phone: (289) 891-9592
Fax: (289) 891-9591 Electoral District: 04

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Ave
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Canada
Phone: (416) 480-6100
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

1 Princess Anne Dr
Georgetown ON  L7G 2B5
Canada
Phone: (905) 873-0111
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Suite 407
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Canada
Phone: (289) 891-9592
Fax: (289) 891-9591
County: Regional Municipality of Halton
Electoral District: 04

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Adetunji James Ade-Conde Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Ade-Conde ( CPSO# 97205 )

Business Address:
407-3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 1M1
Phone Number: (289) 891-9592

Business Address:
LL1
83 Mill Street
Georgetown ON  L7G 5E9
Phone Number: (289) 891-9592


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital Georgetown
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective:22 May 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADETUNJI JAMES ADE-CONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADE-CONDE is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Jan 2012
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 15 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Sep 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2013