THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
19/04/24 8:14:17 AM
Ade-Conde, Adetunji James
CPSO#:
97205
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
17 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
17 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Yoruba
Education: University of Lagos, 1996
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Halton Hills Womens Centre
83 Mill St
Georgetown ON L7G 5E9
Phone: (289) 891-9592
Fax: (289) 891-9591
Electoral District: 04
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Ireland
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation,Georgetown Hospital |
Georgetown |
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Obstetrics and Gynecology |
Effective:22 May 2013 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. ADETUNJI JAMES ADE-CONDE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ADE-CONDE is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 16 Jan 2012 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 16 Jan 2012 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 15 Jan 2015 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 17 Sep 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 17 Sep 2013 |