skip to content

Abdulrehman, Yaasin Yusuf

CPSO#: 86460

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 10 Jul 2014

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Y. Abdulrehman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: 205 Tawa Centre 3017 - 66 Street NW Edmonton, AB T6K 4B2
Date Received: 24 May 2017


Address: c/o Dr. Mary MacDonald Suite 200 1040 Oliver Road Thunder Bay ON P7B 7A5 Tel: 807-345-5056 Fax: 1-888-504-1696
Date Received: 12 Oct 2016

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective:30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Vascular Surgery Effective:30 Sep 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University Of Toronto, 21 Oct 2010 to 10 Nov 2010
EL - Vascular Surgery

University Of Toronto, 02 May 2013 to 29 Jun 2013
EL - Vascular Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 10 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 May 2013
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2014
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017