THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
27/04/24 1:18:45 AM
Abdulrehman, Yaasin Yusuf
CPSO#:
86460
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
01 Jun 2017
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
10 Jul 2014
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English
Education: University of Manitoba, 2007
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Y. Abdulrehman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 28 2017
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
205 Tawa Centre
3017 - 66 Street NW
Edmonton, AB T6K 4B2
Date Received: 24 May 2017
Instructions/Address:
c/o Dr. Mary MacDonald
Suite 200
1040 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7A5
Tel: 807-345-5056
Fax: 1-888-504-1696
Date Received: 12 Oct 2016
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
General Surgery |
Effective:30 Jun 2012 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Vascular Surgery |
Effective:30 Sep 2014 |
RCPSC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery
University of Toronto, 21 Oct 2010 to 10 Nov 2010
EL - Vascular Surgery
University of Toronto, 02 May 2013 to 29 Jun 2013
EL - Vascular Surgery
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2007 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 30 Jun 2009 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 22 Oct 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 10 Nov 2010 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 02 May 2013 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 29 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 10 Jul 2014 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 01 Jun 2017 |