skip to content

Abdulkarim, Emad Hussein

CPSO#: 92299

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Sep 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 26 Sep 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Mosul, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1194 Karn place
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z4
Phone: (613) 521-0999
Fax: (613) 521-0444 Electoral District: 07

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Emad Abdulkarim Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 03 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Abdulkarim ( CPSO# 92299 )

Business Address:
1194 Evans Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1H 7Z4
Phone Number: (613) 410-7338


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Quebec

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:13 Jun 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. EMAD HUSSEIN ABDULKARIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULKARIM is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 04 Dec 2009
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 04 Dec 2009
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 03 Dec 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 23 Apr 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Dec 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2013