THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
28/03/24 19:45:48 PM
Abdulkarim, Emad Hussein
CPSO#:
92299
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
26 Sep 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: University of Mosul, 1988
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
1194 Karn place
Ottawa ON K1H 7Z4
Phone: (613) 521-0999
Fax: (613) 521-0444
Electoral District: 07
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Quebec
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:13 Jun 2013 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. EMAD HUSSEIN ABDULKARIM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDULKARIM is educated and experienced.
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 04 Dec 2009 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 04 Dec 2009 |
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. |
Expiry Date: 03 Dec 2012 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 23 Apr 2010 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 03 Dec 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2013 |