skip to content

Abdul Razak, Albiruni Ryan

CPSO#: 91964

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted as of 01 Jul 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Malay

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Medical Oncology Department
Mt Sinai Hosp
Suite 12-23
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5371
Fax: (416)586-5165 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Dept of Medical Oncology
UHN-PM Cancer Ctr
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Canada
Phone: (416) 586-5371
Fax: (416) 586-5165
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: A. R. Abdul Razak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Abdul Razak ( CPSO# 91964 )

Business Address:
UHN Princess Margaret Hospital
Division of Medical Oncology
Drug Development Program
610 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 2M9
Phone Number: (416) 586-5371

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
Department of Medical Oncology
600 University Avenue
Room 12-23
Toronto ON  M5G 1X9
Phone Number: (416) 586-5371

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Oncology Effective:01 Jul 2013 CPSO Recognized Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective:01 Jul 2020 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 16 Oct 2009
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 17 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Oct 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 20 Sep 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Jul 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2020

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status
Registration Committee Effective: 01 Jul 2020 Active
             1.    Dr. Albiruni Ryan Abdul Razak  may practise medicine only,

                  (i)   in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine,
                        Division  of  Medical Oncology, University of Toronto, in which Dr.
                        Abdul Razak  holds an academic appointment at the rank of Associate
                        Professor, and
                  
                  (ii)  in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.
                  
            2.    The certificate of registration  automatically  expires  when  Dr.  Abdul
                  Razak no longer holds the appointment, referred to in clause 1.