THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 16:41:51 PM
Abdul Razak, Albiruni Ryan
CPSO#:
91964
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
01 Jul 2013
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Restricted
as of
01 Jul 2013
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Malay
Education: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland Sch, 2000
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Medical Oncology Department
Mt Sinai Hosp
Suite 12-23
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON M5G1X5
Phone: (416) 586-5371
Fax: (416)586-5165
Electoral District: 10
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Sinai Health System |
Toronto |
University Health Network Princess Margaret Hospital-Ontario,Cancer Institu |
Toronto |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:01 Jul 2013 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Medical Oncology |
Effective:01 Jul 2020 |
CPSO Recognized Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Toronto, 01 Aug 2009 to 16 Oct 2009
PEAP - CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 17 Oct 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
CF - Medical Oncology
University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
CF - Medical Oncology
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 04 Aug 2009 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 17 Oct 2009 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 20 Sep 2012 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 20 Sep 2012 |
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee |
Effective: 30 Jun 2013 |
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2013 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 21 Jul 2016 |
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
Practice Restrictions
Imposed By |
Effective Date |
Expiry Date |
Status |
Registration Committee |
Effective: 01 Jul 2020 |
|
Active |