skip to content

Abdel-Malak, Maher Naguib Mehany

CPSO#: 84942

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 26 Sep 2006
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 24 Dec 2008

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Cairo, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
22051 Fraser Hwy
Langley BC  V3A4H4
Phone: 604 514 6000

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Maher Abdel-Malak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 4 2019

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.


British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. MAHER NAGUIB MEHANY ABDEL-MALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-MALAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 21 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 22 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 21 Sep 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Dec 2008