THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
23/04/24 15:13:01 PM
Abdel-Malak, Maher Naguib Mehany
CPSO#:
84942
MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of
26 Sep 2006
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice
as of
24 Dec 2008
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Arabic, English
Education: Cairo University Faculty of Medicine, 1980
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
22051 Fraser Hwy
Langley BC V3A4H4
Phone: 604 514 6000
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Dr. Maher Abdel-Malak Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Sep 4 2019
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
British Columbia
Hospital Privileges
Hospital |
Location |
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation |
Oakville |
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:22 Dec 2008 |
CFPC Specialist |
Terms and Conditions
(1) Dr. MAHER NAGUIB MEHANY ABDEL-MALAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDEL-MALAK is educated and experienced.
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 21 Sep 2006
AVP - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 22 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 31 Aug 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Sep 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine
McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate |
Effective: 01 Jul 2006 |
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration |
Expiry: 21 Sep 2006 |
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate |
Effective: 26 Sep 2006 |
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 24 Dec 2008 |