skip to content

Abbasi, Khawar Mahmood

CPSO#: 87561

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2016
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 08 Aug 2007

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu

Education:King Edward Medical College, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Khawar Mahmood Abbasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2016

Medical Records Location

Address: Record Storage & Retrieval Servicess (111 St Regis Crescent South, North York, ON M3J 1Y6, 416-398-0638)
Date Received: 11 Aug 2015

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:06 Dec 2006 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Aug 2007
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2016