THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
25/04/24 12:24:41 PM
Abbasi, Khawar Mahmood
CPSO#:
87561
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
10 Aug 2016
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
08 Aug 2007
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
English, Panjabi/Punjabi, Urdu
Education: King Edward Medical College, 1992
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
PO Box 1320
Golden Opportunity Medical Clinic
Wabasca AB T0G 2K0
Phone: 7807101968
Professional Corporation Information
Corporation Name: Khawar Mahmood Abbasi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: May 6 2016
Medical Records Location
Instructions/Address:
Record Storage & Retrieval Servicess (111 St Regis Crescent South, North York, ON M3J 1Y6, 416-398-0638)
Date Received: 11 Aug 2015
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
Family Medicine |
Effective:06 Dec 2006 |
CFPC Specialist |
Postgraduate Training
Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.
University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 08 Aug 2007 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 10 Aug 2016 |