skip to content

Abbas, Dennis Rahim

CPSO#: 26708

MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of 05 Jun 2018
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None as of 05 Jun 2018
Flag: Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Chinese, English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



USA - Texas

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1974
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate Effective: 28 Dec 2017
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 28 Dec 2017
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 05 Jun 2018

Concerns Flag: indicates a concern or additional information

Source: Member
Active Date: December 28, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dennis Rahim Abbas to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 28, 2017:

Dr. Abbas has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.