THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE DOCTOR SEARCH SECTION OF THE WEBSITE
OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO WWW.CPSO.ON.CA
Date:
24/04/24 21:48:18 PM
Abbas, Dennis Rahim
CPSO#:
26708
MEMBER STATUS
Expired: Resigned from membership as of
05 Jun 2018
CURRENT OR PAST CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
None
as of
28 Dec 2017
Summary
Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.
Former Name:
No Former Name
Gender:
Male
Languages Spoken:
Chinese, English
Education: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 1973
Practice Information
Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions
Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Texas
Specialties
Specialty |
Issued On |
Type |
No Speciality Reported |
|
|
Registration History
Action |
Issue Date |
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate |
Effective: 09 Jul 1974 |
Transfer of class of certificate to: Restricted certificate |
Effective: 28 Dec 2017 |
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate |
Effective: 28 Dec 2017 |
Expired: Resigned from membership. |
Expiry: 05 Jun 2018 |
Concerns
Source:
Member
Active Date: December 28, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Dennis Rahim Abbas to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective December 28, 2017:
Dr. Abbas has voluntarily ceased to practise medicine in Ontario and therefore cannot see any patients or provide any medical advice or services.