skip to content

Weeraratne, Anushka Namal

CPSO#: 101570

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2017

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Health Network - Genera
3050 Lawrence Ave E
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone: 4164382911 Ext. 3415 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W3W3
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Weeraratne Siemieniuk Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 13 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Siemieniuk ( CPSO# 97548 )
Dr. A. Weeraratne ( CPSO# 101570)

Business Address:
408-1 Young Street
Hamilton ON  L8N 1T8
Phone Number: (905) 523-6766

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
3030 Birchmount Road
Scarborough ON  M1W 3W3
Phone Number: (416) 495-2423

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Hospital General Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective:30 Jun 2017 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANUSHKA NAMAL WEERARATNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WEERARATNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017