skip to content

Toth, Agnes

CPSO#: 86824

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2009

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Hungarian

Education:Western University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111 Electoral District: 06

Additional Practice Location(s)

CKL After Hours Clinic
55 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 5B7
Canada
Phone: (705) 880-1213
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

HKPR Health Unit - LIndsay Office
108 Angeline Street South
Lindsay ON  K9V 3L5
Canada
Phone: 1-866-888-4577 Ext. 1205
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Agnes Toth Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 04 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Toth ( CPSO# 86824 )

Business Address:
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AGNES TOTH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOTH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 01 Jul 2009 to 31 Dec 2009
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Enhanced Skills)

University Of Toronto, 09 Sep 2013 to 29 Nov 2013
CF - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2009
Dear members, your member portal will be unavailable for maintenance and updates from August 5th 5pm to August 9th 9am. We apologize for the inconvenience and appreciate your patience.