skip to content

Sikand, Aman

CPSO#: 96969

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 31 Oct 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 31 Oct 2013

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: (905) 494-6571 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Etobicoke General Hospital
89 Humber College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 4B8
Canada
Phone: (416) 494-2120
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Peel Memorial
20 Lynch St.
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8
Canada
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Sikand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Sikand ( CPSO# 96969 )

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
William Osler Health System
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (905) 494-2120

Business Address:
20 Lynch Street
Brampton ON  L6W 2Z8

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre,for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:29 Oct 2013 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective:22 Dec 2015 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. AMAN SIKAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SIKAND is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



Western University, 25 Oct 2011 to 17 Jan 2012
AVP - Family Medicine

Western University, 18 Jan 2012 to 24 Oct 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Western University, 25 Oct 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2013 to 24 Oct 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Western University, 01 Jul 2015 to 03 Oct 2015
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jan 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 24 Oct 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Oct 2013