skip to content

Patel, Alex

CPSO#: 82969

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 17 Nov 2010
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 17 Nov 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6175 Highway #7
Units 19-20
L6R 3J7
Vaughan ON  L4H 0P6
Phone: (905) 850-3091
Fax: 416-840-8434 Electoral District: 05

Additional Practice Location(s)

Etobicoke General Hospital
101 Humbar College Blvd
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Canada
Phone: (416) 747-3400
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Alex Patel Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Patel ( CPSO# 82969 )

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 1R8
Phone Number: (416) 494-2120

Business Address:
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Business Address:
Unit 19-22
6175 Highway 7
Woodbridge ON  L4H 0P6
Phone Number: (905) 850-3091

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective:31 Jul 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective:27 Sep 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEX PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Jul 2008
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2008 to 31 Jul 2009
PostGrad Yr 4 - Critical Care Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Aug 2009 to 31 Jul 2010
PostGrad Yr 5 - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Jul 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2010