skip to content

Jalal, Adnan Bin

CPSO#: 89364

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 15 Jan 2013
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department Of Anesthesia
1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone: (306) 990-0300 Electoral District: 01

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Adnan Jalal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 13 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jalal ( CPSO# 89364 )

Business Address:
Windsor Regional Hospital
Department of Anesthesia
1030 Ouellette Avenue
Windsor ON  N9A 1E1
Phone Number: (306) 990-0300


Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.



Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Windsor Regional Hospital,Ouellette Campus Windsor

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 23 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ADNAN BIN JALAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JALAL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 23 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 24 Sep 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2013
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2014