skip to content

Chittle, Andrea Diane

CPSO#: 88446

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 29 Mar 2011

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistr, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Sanguen Health Centre
29 Young St E
Waterloo ON  N2J 2L4
Phone: (519) 603-0223
Fax: (519) 888-6422 Electoral District: 03

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 130
235 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 4N5
Canada
Phone: 5197439360
Fax: 5197436710
County: Regional Municipality of Waterloo
Electoral District: 03

SA/DV Care and Treatment Centre
Guelph General Hospital
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Canada
Phone: (519) 837-6440 Ext. 2728
Fax: 519-837-6415
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Guelph Covid Assessment Centre
400 Southgate Drive
Guelph ON  N1G 4P5
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

50 Stone Rd E
1st Fl, JT Powell Bldg
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Canada
Phone: 519-824-4120 Ext. 52131
Fax: 519-821-2308
County: County of Wellington
Electoral District: 03

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Dr. Andrea D. Chittle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Feb 6 2019
Corporation Name: Dr. Dean A. Raso and Dr. Andrea D. Chittle Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 16 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Raso ( CPSO# 86220 )
Dr. A. Chittle ( CPSO# 88446 )

Business Address:
Suite 130
235 King Street East
Kitchener ON  N2G 4N5
Phone Number: (519) 743-9360

Business Address:
SA/DV Care and Treatment Centre
Guelph General Hospital
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4
Phone Number: (519) 837-6440

Business Address:
Sanguen Health Centre
29 Young Street East
Waterloo ON  N2J 2L4
Phone Number: (519) 603-0223

Business Address:
115 Delhi St
Guelph ON  N1E 4J4

Business Address:
JT Powell Building
50 Stone Rd E
1st Floor
Guelph ON  N1G 2W1
Phone Number: 519-824-4120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:24 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ANDREA DIANE CHITTLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHITTLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 May 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Mar 2011