skip to content

Bongard, Alexandra Frances

CPSO#: 88599

MEMBER STATUS
Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008
CPSO REGISTRATION CLASS
Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2010

Summary

Lorem ipsum dolor sit amet, consectetur adipiscing elit. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur non nulla sit amet nisl tempus convallis quis ac lectus. Curabitur aliquet quam id dui posuere blandit. Vivamus suscipit tortor eget felis porttitor volutpat. Curabitur arcu erat, accumsan id imperdiet et, porttitor at sem. Vestibulum ac diam sit amet quam vehicula elementum sed sit amet dui. Donec sollicitudin molestie malesuada. Pellentesque in ipsum id orci porta dapibus.

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
150 York Street
#1500
Toronto ON  M5H3S5
Phone: 4163505900
Fax: 4163505981 Electoral District: 10

Additional Practice Location(s)

Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Canada
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Professional Corporation Information


Corporation Name: Alexandra F. Bongard Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 01 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bongard ( CPSO# 88599 )

Business Address:
Suite 1500
150 York Street
Toronto ON  M5H 3S5

Business Address:
Scarborough General Hospital
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 438-2911

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Scarborough Hospital,General Site Toronto
Scarborough Hospital-Birchmount Campus Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective:22 Jun 2010 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

(1) Dr. ALEXANDRA FRANCES BONGARD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BONGARD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.



University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University Of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Western University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2010